Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0795339

EP0795339 - Urine drainage catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VIA LOG Medikalprodukte GmbH Kosmetik - Medien
Im Weidenfeld 9
D-75378 Bad Liebenzell / DE
[1997/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Hutzler, Martin
Im Weidenfeld 9
75378 Bad Liebenzell / DE
[1997/38]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/38]KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97104214.813.03.1997
[1997/38]
Priority number, dateDE199610971413.03.1996         Original published format: DE 19609714
[1997/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0795339
Date:17.09.1997
Language:DE
[1997/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0795339
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/00
[1997/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1997/38]
TitleGerman:Katheter zur Harnableitung[1997/38]
English:Urine drainage catheter[1997/38]
French:Cathéter pour l'évacuation d'urine[1997/38]
Examination procedure06.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/15]
04.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2002Fee for grant paid
15.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.03.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
[2004/31]
Former [2004/22]CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0384476  (LIEBENZELLER VERPACKUNG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * column A; figures 1-7; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]DE3441586  (WIEDECK JOERG GUENTER DR MED) [A] 1-7 * column A; figures 1,2; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]DE330284  (ALBRECHT MEYENBERG DR)