Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0797128

EP0797128 - Charging roll [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD.
3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/39]For all designated states
TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD.
3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Itoh, Tetsuya, c/o Tokai Rubber Ind. Ltd.
3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Yamamoto, Takafumi, c/o Tokai Rubber Ind. Ltd.
3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Sugiura, Hiroki, c/o Tokai Rubber Ind. Ltd.
3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Kawano, Atsuhiro, c/o Tokai Rubber Ind. Ltd.
3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
05 / Imamura, Wataru, c/o Tokai Rubber Ind. Ltd.
3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
06 / Hayashi, Saburou, c/o Tokai Rubber Ind. Ltd.
3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[1997/39]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [1997/39]Vollnhals, Aurel, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date97104598.418.03.1997
[1997/39]
Priority number, dateJP1996006260919.03.1996         Original published format: JP 6260996
[1997/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0797128
Date:24.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0797128
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/02
[1997/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/39]
TitleGerman:Aufladewalze[1997/39]
English:Charging roll[1997/39]
French:Rouleau de chargement[1997/39]
Examination procedure18.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/39]
20.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/15]
09.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200509   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0636949  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-7,9-15,17-20 * column 5, line 2 - column 9, line 26; figures 1,5-7 *;
 [A]JPH01191161  ;
 [A]EP0631205  (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7,9,11,13-15,17,19 * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 56; figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891031), vol. 013, no. 480, Database accession no. (P - 952), [A] 1,3,12,15,20 * abstract *