Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0801969 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0801969



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 112
28.07.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
07.06.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
11.05.2005 Claims Appeal 1
11.05.2005 Claims Appeal 1
11.05.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
11.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.05.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 4
10.03.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.03.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
01.03.2005 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.12.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.11.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
22.08.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
14.08.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
16.03.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 5
14.02.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
12.02.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.02.2002 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
08.02.2002 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
08.02.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
01.09.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
25.05.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.11.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.11.1999 Description Search / examination 4
12.11.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
01.10.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.06.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.06.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
17.04.1997 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.04.1997 Priority document Search / examination 9
21.03.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.03.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
21.03.1997 Description Search / examination 5
21.03.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.03.1997 Drawings Search / examination 1
21.03.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6