Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0799749

EP0799749 - Catching device for a drive unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.12.2001
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.02.2002  [2002/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft
Porschestrasse 42
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[1997/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Rebmann, Rolf
Bergstrasse 29
70186 Stuttgart / DE
[1997/41]
Application number, filing date97104928.322.03.1997
[1997/41]
Priority number, dateDE199611387006.04.1996         Original published format: DE 19613870
[1997/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0799749
Date:08.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0799749
Date:14.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/00
[1997/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/41]
TitleGerman:Fangvorrichtung für ein Antriebsaggregat[1997/41]
English:Catching device for a drive unit[1997/41]
French:Dispositif de retenue pour un groupe propulseur[1997/41]
Examination procedure12.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/19]
23.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.08.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2000Fee for grant paid
14.09.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0566840  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * column A; figure . * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 38 *;
 [Y]EP0598685  (I DE A S P A INST OF DEV IN AU [IT]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 25 - line 42 *;
 [A]DE4341357  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3141164  (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 3; figures 1-4; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]DE4230669  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *