blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0801055


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
19.11.1999 (Expected) grant published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
20.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
25.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
12.04.1999 Renewal fee
09.03.1999 Examination report or reply
15.01.1999 First examination report
12.01.1999 Examination report or reply
24.04.1998 Request for examination filed published on  10.06.1998 [1998/24]
29.08.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.10.1997 [1997/42]