blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0801055
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59700945D 10.02.2000D1
Priority number Date
DE59700945 27.03.1997
DE19614270 11.04.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP4122074BGlobal Dossier 23.07.2008B2
JPH1036333 10.02.1998A
Priority number Date
DE19614270 11.04.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0801055Global Dossier 05.01.2000B1
EP0801055 15.10.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19614270 11.04.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2202021 21.06.2005C
CA2202021 11.10.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19614270 11.04.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19614270 16.10.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19614270 11.04.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2143815T 16.05.2000T3
Priority number Date
DE19614270 11.04.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5786438 28.07.1998A
Priority number Date
DE19614270 11.04.1996