Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0801055

EP0801055 - Mixtures of homologues and isomers of cycloaliphatic diisocyanates and their use in the preparation of polyisocyanate addition products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[1997/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Scholl, Hans-Joachim, Dr.
Am Feldrain 5
51061 Köln / DE
02 / Jansen, Bernhard, Dr.
Roggendorfstrasse 65
51061 Köln / DE
03 / Jost, Klaus, Dr.
Gneisenaustrasse 15a
41539 Dormagen / DE
04 / Meyer, Rolf-Volker, Dr.
Walter-Flex-Strasse 11
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[1997/42]
Application number, filing date97105178.427.03.1997
[1997/42]
Priority number, dateDE199611427011.04.1996         Original published format: DE 19614270
[1997/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0801055
Date:15.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0801055
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07C265/10, C08G18/75
[1997/42]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/42]
TitleGerman:Homologen- und Isomerengemische von cycloaliphatischen Diisocyanaten sowie ihre Verwendung als Aufbaukomponente bei der Herstellung von Polyisocyanat-Additionsprodukten[1997/42]
English:Mixtures of homologues and isomers of cycloaliphatic diisocyanates and their use in the preparation of polyisocyanate addition products[1997/42]
French:Mélanges d'homologues et d'isomères de diisocyanates cycloaliphatiques ainsi que leur utilisation dans la préparation de produits d'addition de polyisocyanates[1997/42]
Examination procedure15.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/24]
15.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.1999Fee for grant paid
11.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0058368  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 8, line 17 - page 9, column 15; example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0128382  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * claim - *;
 [A]US3351650  (MARTIN CROSS JAMES, et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 3; example -; claim - *