Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0801235

EP0801235 - Cap for a nut and tool for its manipulation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
e i b e Produktion- + Vertrieb GmbH
Industriestrasse 1
97285 Röttingen / DE
[1997/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Eichinger, Hartmut
Industriestr. 1
97285 Röttingen / DE
[1997/42]
Representative(s)Pöhner, Wilfried Anton
Patentanwalt Dr. W. Pöhner
Kaiserstrasse 33
Postfach 6323
97013 Würzburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/42]Pöhner, Wilfried Anton, Dr.
Postfach 63 23
97013 Würzburg / DE
Application number, filing date97105766.608.04.1997
[1997/42]
Priority number, dateDE199611418111.04.1996         Original published format: DE 19614181
[1997/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0801235
Date:15.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0801235
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:F16B23/00, F16B41/00
[1997/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1997/42]
Extension statesSI09.05.1997
TitleGerman:Abdeckring für eine Mutter und Werkzeug zur Handhabung[1997/42]
English:Cap for a nut and tool for its manipulation[1997/42]
French:Capuchon pour écrou et outil pour sa manipulation[1997/42]
Examination procedure01.10.1997Examination requested  [1997/49]
21.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
02.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09)
25.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2002Fee for grant paid
18.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
IT25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
AT08.04.2003
LU08.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2007/17]FR25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
AT08.04.2003
LU08.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2006/14]FR25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
AT08.04.2003
LU08.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/43]GB25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
AT08.04.2003
LU08.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/39]GB25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
LU08.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/28]GB25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/22]GB25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/21]GB25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/30]NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE25.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2090361  (P & S ENGINEERING) [X] 1,2,4 * page 1, lines 63-107; figure - *;
 [PA]WO9622471  (SIMONSON PETER MELOTT [US]) [PA] 1,2 * page 30, line 20 - page 32, line 8; figure 11 *;
 [A]GB2159447  (MORRIS RODGER MALCOLM) [A] 1,2,6,7 * abstract *;
 [A]US5071300  (MCCAULEY DURHAM S [US]) [A] 1-3 * column A; figure - *