Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0801491

EP0801491 - Apparatus for data transmission between a mobile data unit and a central switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lerchner, Leonhard
Clemens-Krauss-Strasse 21/4/13
5020 Salzburg / AT
For all designated states
Hainzlmaier, Hermann
Högnerstrasse 17
85290 Geisenfeld / DE
[1997/42]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/42]
Representative(s)LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler
Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
ALPHA-Haus
Garmischer Strasse 35
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/42]Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Czybulka
Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38
81669 München / DE
Application number, filing date97105856.509.04.1997
[1997/42]
Priority number, dateDE199611455612.04.1996         Original published format: DE 19614556
[1997/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0801491
Date:15.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0801491
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04M11/00, G07C1/20, G07C9/00
[2002/48]
Former International [1997/42]H04M11/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1997/42]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Datenfernübertragung zwischen einem beweglichen Datenträger und einer Zentrale[1997/42]
English:Apparatus for data transmission between a mobile data unit and a central switch[1997/42]
French:Appareil pour la transmission de données entre une unité mobile de données et un central[1997/42]
Examination procedure28.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
20.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.07.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200206   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2002
30.04.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]US4495496  (MILLER III SCOTT A [US]) [Y] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 26 * * column 3, line 45 - line 56 * * column 4, lines 34-61; figures 1,2 * [A] 3;
 [A]US4636950  (CASWELL ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 40 - line 61; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 4 - line 41 *;
 [Y]WO9325918  (SAAB SCANIA COMBITECH AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1,4,5 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 10, paragraphs 2,4 * * claims 13-19 *;
 [A]US5450492  (HOOK CHRISTOPHER D [GB], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 8, line 20 - line 60; figures 2,3,6 * * column 13, lines 10-15 * * column 14, line 40 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9315418  (SAAB SCANIA COMBITECH AB [SE]) [A] 1,4 * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 5 * * page 8, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 12, paragraph 5; figure 7 *