Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0800927

EP0800927 - Thermal transfer image receiving material and heat mode recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.06.2001 [2001/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/42]For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Maejima, Katsumi
c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Takeyama, Tomoko
c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
03 / Nakajima, Atsushi
c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
04 / Takeda, Katsuyuki
c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
[1997/42]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/42]Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date97105905.010.04.1997
[1997/42]
Priority number, dateJP1996009106712.04.1996         Original published format: JP 9106796
[1997/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0800927
Date:15.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0800927
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/00, B41M5/40
[1997/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1999/49]
Former [1997/42]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL 
TitleGerman:Bildempfangsmaterial für thermische Übertragung und wärmempfindliches Aufzeichnungsverfahren[1997/42]
English:Thermal transfer image receiving material and heat mode recording method[1997/42]
French:Matériaux récepteurs d'images pour transfert thermique et méthode pour l'enregistrement par la chaleur[1997/42]
Examination procedure25.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/21]
28.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.1999Fee for grant paid
24.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0703091  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 2, line 47 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 11 - line 28 * * example 1; claims 1-10 *;
 [X]EP0574055  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-13 * page 2, line 41 - line 50 * * page 3, line 36 - line 51 * * page 4, line 17 - line 54 * * example 3; claims 1,7-10,14 *;
 [X]EP0409526  (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1-13 * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 14 * * example 1; claims 1-6 *;
 [X]US5252535  (MARTIN THOMAS W [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 39 - line 55 * * column 3, line 4 - line 11 * * column 4, line 15 - line 58 * * column 5, line 5 - line 9 * * example 1; claims 1,10,12 *