Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0787981

EP0787981 - Impurity measuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/32]Impurity measuring method and apparatus
[2004/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2005
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.12.2005  [2005/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
Former [1997/32]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Maeda, Ayako
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
02 / Yoshii, Shintaro
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
03 / Kageyama, Mokuji
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
04 / Ogino, Masanobu
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
[1997/32]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/32]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97105931.619.04.1989
[1997/32]
Priority number, dateJP1988010219925.04.1988         Original published format: JP 10219988
[1997/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0787981
Date:06.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0787981
Date:26.07.2000
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0787981
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N1/02, G01N31/00
[1997/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/32]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Messung von Verunreinigungen[2004/31]
English:Impurity measuring method[2004/31]
French:Méthode pour la mesure des impuretés[2004/31]
Former [1997/32]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung von Verunreinigungen
Former [1997/32]Impurity measuring method and apparatus
Former [1997/32]Méthode et appareil pour la mesure des impuretés
Examination procedure30.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/32]
07.03.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2004Fee for grant paid
22.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP89107038.5  / EP0339463
Opposition(s)23.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
30.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 09
23.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 10
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 11
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 12
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 13
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 14
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 15
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.199810   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.1998
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2097692  (SHAW STEWART P D) [A] 1-6,30,45-50 * page 1, line 5 - line 47; figure - *;
 [A]GB1211010  (ELEVITCH FRANKLIN RAY [US]) [A] 1-6,30,45-50 * figure .; claims 1-3 *
 [A]  IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, vol. 22, no. 8A, January 1980, page 3349 J.S. DRIER et al.: "Method of extracting material from the surface of a magnetic disk", XP002138721 [A] 1-6,30,45-50 * the whole document *
 [A]  EXTENDED ABSTRACTS OF THE 16th (1984 INTERNATIONAL) CONFERENCE ON SOLID STATE DEVICES AND MATERIALS, KOBE, JAPAN; JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS SUPPLEMENTS, 30 September 1984, pages 281-284 A. SHIMAZAKI et al.: "Chemical analysis of ultratrace impurities in SiO2 films", XP002138722 [A] 1-6,30,45-50 * abstract *
Examination   SEMICONDUCTOR RESEARCH CENTER OF KYUSHU ELECTRONIC METAL (KABUSHIKI KAISHA), JAPAN ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY ACADEMY, 2ND JAPAN-KOREA JOINT SYMPOSIUM ON ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY IN KUMAMOTO, (19871014),