Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0802321

EP0802321 - Intake system in engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/43]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Numata, Tomoyuki
K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Kikuchi, Masahiro
K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Oohata, Satoru
K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
04 / Sasaki, Katsuo
K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
[1997/43]
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg , et al
c/o Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Straße 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/43]Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date97106023.111.04.1997
[1997/43]
Priority number, dateJP1996009419416.04.1996         Original published format: JP 9419496
[1997/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0802321
Date:22.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0802321
Date:08.04.1998
[1998/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0802321
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:F02M35/116
[1997/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/43]
TitleGerman:Einlasssystem in einer Brennkraftmaschine[1997/43]
English:Intake system in engine[1997/43]
French:Système d'admission dans un moteur[1997/43]
Examination procedure10.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/37]
23.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.1999Fee for grant paid
03.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US5101792  (KOCH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 62 - line 68; figure 4 *;
 [A]JPH0565857  (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JPH07269431  (AISIN TAKAOKA LTD) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [DA]US4708097  (HATAMURA KOUICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH04124455  ;
 [A]JPH07332182  ;
 [A]EP0271811  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3629877  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4898125  (AMPFERER HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4901681  (POZNIAK DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5220889  (AMPFERER HERBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920814), vol. 016, no. 380, Database accession no. (M - 1295), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 096, no. 004, [A] 1 * abstract *