Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0801993

EP0801993 - Rotary atomizing electrostatic coating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/31]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi / JP
Former [1997/43]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Honma, Kengo
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
02 / Yamasaki, Isamu
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
[1997/43]
Representative(s)Grams, Klaus Dieter , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/43]Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date97106290.616.04.1997
[1997/43]
Priority number, dateJP1996009554917.04.1996         Original published format: JP 9554996
[1997/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0801993
Date:22.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0801993
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0801993
Date:30.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:B05B5/04, B05B5/03
[1997/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/43]
TitleGerman:Rotierende elektrostatische Sprühvorrichtung[1997/43]
English:Rotary atomizing electrostatic coating apparatus[1997/43]
French:Appareil rotatif de pulvérisation électrostatique[1997/43]
Examination procedure16.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/43]
22.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2003Fee for grant paid
27.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3931726  (GRACO INC [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, lines 50-57; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4605168  (TACHI KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 4, lines 52-60; figure - *;
 [A]US4337895  (GALLEN THOMAS) [A] 1,7 * column 3, lines 55-61; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4597533  (SHIRAI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * column W *