Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0809971

EP0809971 - Spinal column retaining system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.03.2004  [2004/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DePuy AcroMed, Inc.
325 Paramount Drive
Raynham, MA 02767-0350 / US
[2002/46]
Former [1997/49]For all designated states
ACROMED CORPORATION
3303 Carnegie Avenue
Cleveland Ohio 44115 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Benzel, Edward C.
380 Bighorn Ridge
Albuquerque, New Mexico 87122 / US
02 / Yuan, Hansen A.
5066 Pine Valley Dr.
Fayetteville, New York 13066 / US
03 / DiNello, Alex
133 Primrose Way
Pala Alto, California 94303 / US
04 / Wefers, Michael H.
1312 S. Belvoir Boulevard
South Euclid, Ohio 44121 / US
05 / Smith, Aaron C.
5143 Meadowridge Lane
Gibsonia, Pennsylvania 15044 / US
[1997/49]
Representative(s)Rottmann, Maximilian , et al
Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG
Gartenstrasse 28 A
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [1997/49]Rottmann, Maximilian R. , et al
c/o Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37
8052 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date97106886.125.04.1997
[1997/49]
Priority number, dateUS1996065585131.05.1996         Original published format: US 655851
[1997/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0809971
Date:03.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0809971
Date:07.01.1998
[1998/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0809971
Date:09.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70
[1997/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1997/49]
TitleGerman:System zum Festhalten der Wirbelsäule[1997/49]
English:Spinal column retaining system[1997/49]
French:Système de retenue rachidienne[1997/49]
Examination procedure22.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/49]
26.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
13.09.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
26.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2002Fee for grant paid
29.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0570929  (PINA VERTRIEBS AG [CH]) [X] 1-10,19-22 * abstract * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 16; figures 9-11 * [A] 11-18;
 [XA]EP0679370  (SCHAEFER MICOMED GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,19-22 * abstract * [A] 11-18;
 [XA]FR2713473  (CAFFINIERE DE JEAN YVES [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-10,19-22 * abstract * [A] 11-18;
 [A]EP0599640  (CODMAN & SHURTLEFF [US]) [A] 1,2,5-9,18,19 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - page 3, column 19 *