Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0805514

EP0805514 - Self-phase up of array antennas with non-uniform element mutual coupling and arbitrary lattice orientation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAYTHEON COMPANY
141 Spring Street
Lexington
Massachusetts 02173 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
RAYTHEON COMPANY
141 Spring Street
Lexington, Massachusetts 02173 / US
Former [1998/49]For all designated states
RAYTHEON COMPANY
141 Spring Street
Lexington Massachusetts 02173 / US
Former [1997/45]For all designated states
HE HOLDINGS, INC. dba HUGHES ELECTRONICS
7200 Hughes Terrace
Los Angeles, CA 90045-0066 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lewis, Gib F.
200 The Strand
Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US
02 / Boe, Eric N.
212 Euclid Avenue No. 101
Long Beach, CA 90803 / US
[1997/45]
Representative(s)Witte, Alexander , et al
Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121
70178 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/45]Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121
70178 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97107195.630.04.1997
[1997/45]
Priority number, dateUS1996064203302.05.1996         Original published format: US 642033
[1997/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0805514
Date:05.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0805514
Date:14.01.1998
[1998/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0805514
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01Q21/00, H01Q3/26
[1998/02]
Former International [1997/45]H01Q21/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [1997/45]
TitleGerman:Selbst-Eichung einer Gruppenantenne mit ungleichmässiger gegenseitiger Kupplung der Antennenelemente und willkürlicher Orientierung des Antennnengitters[1997/45]
English:Self-phase up of array antennas with non-uniform element mutual coupling and arbitrary lattice orientation[1997/45]
French:Auto-calibration d'antenne-réseaux avec couplage mutuel non-uniforme des éléments d'antennes et orientation arbitraire du treillis d'antennes[1997/45]
Examination procedure27.06.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/35]
15.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.1999Fee for grant paid
01.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2171849  (SECR DEFENCE) [A] 1 * page 1, line 110 - page 2, line 129; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5063529  (CHAPOTON CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 4 - column 15, line 33; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5477229  (CAILLE GERARD [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 26 - column 11, line 35; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]GB2259778  (COSSOR ELECTRONICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 36 - page 9, line 14; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4176354  (HSIAO JAMES K [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 65; figure 1 *