Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0807619

EP0807619 - Process for the production of diaryl carbonates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[1997/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Buysch, Hans-Josef, Dr.
Brandenburger Strasse 28
47809 Krefeld / DE
02 / Hesse, Carsten, Dr.
Buschstrasse 151
47800 Krefeld / DE
03 / Rechner, Johann, Dr.
Friedrich-Kramer-Strasse 2
47906 Kempen / DE
[1997/47]
Application number, filing date97107407.512.05.1997
[1997/47]
Priority number, dateDE199611994917.05.1996         Original published format: DE 19619949
[1997/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0807619
Date:19.11.1997
Language:DE
[1997/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0807619
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07C68/00, C07C69/96
[1997/47]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/47]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Diarylcarbonaten[1997/47]
English:Process for the production of diaryl carbonates[1997/47]
French:Procédé de fabrication de carbonates de diaryle[1997/47]
Examination procedure19.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/29]
25.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2002Fee for grant paid
25.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB12.05.2003
[2004/22]
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0583938  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DA] 1 * page 4, column 6 - page 5, column 8; examples 1-3 * * page 5, column 8 - page 6, column 10; claim - *;
 [A]DE2815512  (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 9; claim - *