Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0790561

EP0790561 - Image displaying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/22]For all designated states
Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome
Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
Former [1997/34]For all designated states
CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD.
6-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-02 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawai, Yoshio, c/o Casio Computer Co. Ltd.
Hamura R & D Center, 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205 / JP
02 / Sato, Shinichiro, c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd
Hamura R & D Center, 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205 / JP
03 / Kobayshi, Yuichi, c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd
Hamura R & D Center, 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205 / JP
04 / Oshima, Jun, c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd
Hamura R & D Center, 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205 / JP
[1997/34]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/34]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97107592.417.08.1994
[1997/34]
Priority number, dateJP1993021040625.08.1993         Original published format: JP 21040693
JP1993029507225.11.1993         Original published format: JP 29507293
JP1993031209113.12.1993         Original published format: JP 31209193
[1997/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0790561
Date:20.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0790561
Date:11.02.1998
[1998/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0790561
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP30.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/02, G06T7/20, G06T11/00
[1999/35]
Former International [1998/06]G06F15/02, G06T15/70
Former International [1997/34]G06F15/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/34]
TitleGerman:Bildanzeigegerät[1997/34]
English:Image displaying apparatus[1997/34]
French:Appareil d'affichage d'image[1997/34]
Examination procedure07.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/34]
12.11.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
10.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
20.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.12.1999Fee for grant paid
02.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94112830.8  / EP0640928
Divisional application(s)EP99123598.7  / EP0992915
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
16.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199805   M06   Fee paid on   16.11.1998
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2122855  (SHARP KK) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 123 - page 3, line 20; figures 3,5 *;
 [XA]US4181971  (FREY RICHARD C [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, line 48 - line 62 * [A] 2-17;
 [A]WO9315456  (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 15, line 6 - page 16, line 3; figures 5A-D *;
 [A]JPS63282569  ;
 [A]JPH01300830  ;
 [A]JPH0573531  ;
 [A]JPH0293861  ;
 [A]JPS63251828
 [A]  - WEINER ET AL, "A Computer Animation Movie Language for Educational Motion Pictures", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FALL JOINT COMPUTER CONFERENCE, SAN FRANCISCO, US, (196812), pages 1317 - 1320, XP002049556 [A] 1-17 * figures 2,7 *
 [A]  - GIRARD ET AL, "Interactive design of 3D computer-animated legged animal motion", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, NEW YORK, US, (198706), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 39 - 51, XP002049557 [A] 1-17 * figure 6 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890310), vol. 13, no. 102, Database accession no. (P - 841), [A] 1-17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900219), vol. 14, no. 86, Database accession no. (C - 690), [A] 1-17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930728), vol. 17, no. 405, Database accession no. (P - 1581), [A] 1-17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900627), vol. 14, no. 298, Database accession no. (P - 1068), [A] 1-17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890214), vol. 13, no. 64, Database accession no. (P - 827), [A] 1-17 * abstract *