Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0808072

EP0808072 - Recording medium having video data stored therein which is capable of forcibly reproducing sub-picture in accordance with state of reproduction and system for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 212-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/15]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-8572 / JP
Former [1997/47]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hisatomi, Shuichi, c/o K. K. Toshiba, Int Prop Div
1-1 Shibaura 1 chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
[1997/47]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/47]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97107797.913.05.1997
[1997/47]
Priority number, dateJP1996011906714.05.1996         Original published format: JP 11906796
[1997/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0808072
Date:19.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0808072
Date:14.01.1998
[1998/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0808072
Date:10.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/804
[1998/03]
Former International [1997/47]H04N9/82
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1997/47]
TitleGerman:Aufnahmemittel mit darin gespeicherten Videodaten, das in der Lage ist um zwingend Hilfsbilder wiederzugeben in Übereinstimmung mit dem Stand der Wiedergabe, und System zu diesem Zweck[1997/47]
English:Recording medium having video data stored therein which is capable of forcibly reproducing sub-picture in accordance with state of reproduction and system for the same[1997/47]
French:Moyen d'enregistrement muni de données vidéo emmagasinées là-dedans, qui est capable de reproduire des images supplémentaires suivant l'état de reproduction, et système à cet effet[1997/47]
Examination procedure10.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/47]
02.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
28.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2002Fee for grant paid
17.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5237426  (DAITO) [A] 1,12,23,34,45,56 * column W *;
 [A]EP0661888  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD) [A] 1,12,23,34,45,56 * column 1, line 1 - column 8, line 56; figures 1,5 *;
 [A]EP0546189  (BINET CO., LTD) [A] 1,12,23,34,45,56 * column W *;
 [A]EP0633560  (MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [A] 1,12,23,34,45,56 * column 41, line 3 - column 46, line 44; figure 12 *;
 [A]WO9430014  (SONY CORPORATION) [A] 1,12,23,34,45,56 * page 8, line 19 - page 12, line 19; figure 2 *