blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0809123

EP0809123 - Millimeter wave imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.04.2005  [2005/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OMRON CORPORATION
10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku
Kyoto / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/48]For all designated states
OMRON CORPORATION
10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku
Kyoto / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Huguenin, Richard G.
1C Adams Court
South Deerfield, Massachusetts 01373 / US
02 / Moore, Ellen
1C Adams Court
South Deerfield, Massachusetts 01373 / US
03 / Kolodzinski, Robert
411 Burts Pit Road
Northampton, Massachusetts 01060 / US
04 / Kapitzky, John E.
59 Pioneer Knolls
Florence, Massachusetts 01060 / US
[1997/48]
Representative(s)Käck, Jürgen, et al
Patentanwälte
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/40]Käck, Jürgen, et al
Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg / DE
Former [1997/48]Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., Vorderer Anger 268
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
Application number, filing date97108189.821.05.1997
[1997/48]
Priority number, dateUS1996065124322.05.1996         Original published format: US 651243
[1997/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0809123
Date:26.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0809123
Date:09.08.2000
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0809123
Date:06.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:G01V3/12, H01Q19/06, G01R29/08, G01V8/00
[2000/32]
CPC:
H01Q19/06 (EP,US); G03B42/06 (KR); G01V8/005 (EP,US);
G03B42/02 (KR); H04N23/30 (KR); H04N23/55 (KR)
Former IPC [1997/48]G01V3/12, H01Q19/06, G01R29/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/48]
TitleGerman:Millimeterwellenbildsystem[1997/48]
English:Millimeter wave imaging system[1997/48]
French:Système de prise de vue à ondes millimétriques[1997/48]
Examination procedure09.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/15]
07.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2004Fee for grant paid
05.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5455589  (HUGUENIN GEORGE R [US], et al);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.