Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0816775

EP0816775 - Gas fired water circulation heater [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1998/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Ehrle, Heinz
Wilhemstrasse 20
73249 Wernau / DE
02 / Schmidt, Ernst
Dornwaldstrasse 20
73230 Kirchheim / DE
03 / Schmuker, Franz
Fruehlingstrasse 29
73117 Wangen / DE
04 / Lenckner, Hans-Ulrich
Steigstrasse 11
72622 Nürtingen / DE
[1998/02]
Application number, filing date97108554.328.05.1997
[1998/02]
Priority number, dateDE199612632101.07.1996         Original published format: DE 19626321
[1998/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0816775
Date:07.01.1998
Language:DE
[1998/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0816775
Date:23.12.1998
[1998/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0816775
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:F24H1/44, F24H9/00
[1998/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/35]
Former [1998/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gasbeheizter Umlauf-Wasserheizer[1998/02]
English:Gas fired water circulation heater[1998/02]
French:Chauffe-eau à circulation à gaz[1998/02]
Examination procedure23.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/33]
18.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2002Fee for grant paid
12.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
IT25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]FR25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/21]GB25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]NL25.09.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/30]NL25.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]NL8403088  (FASTO BV) [X] 1,2 * figure .; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0237443  (CHAFFOTEAUX ET MAURY [FR]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4224212  (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1;
 [A]NL7809670  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1,5 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0643278  (SHOWA ALUMINIUM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 6 * column 6, line 28 - column 6, line 56; figures 10,11 *;
 [A]FR2050273  (CALOTECH ETS)