Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0814611

EP0814611 - Communication system and method for recording and managing digital images [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.2003  [2003/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/52]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mattes, Heinz, Dr.
Otto-Wels-Strasse 7
81739 München / DE
[1997/52]
Application number, filing date97108926.303.06.1997
[1997/52]
Priority number, dateDE199612412817.06.1996         Original published format: DE 19624128
[1997/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0814611
Date:29.12.1997
Language:DE
[1997/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0814611
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0814611
Date:28.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/14, H04N1/00
[2000/28]
Former International [1997/52]H04N7/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/15]
Former [2001/12]
Former [1997/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kommunikationssystem und Verfahren zur Aufnahme und Verwaltung digitaler Bilder[1997/52]
English:Communication system and method for recording and managing digital images[1997/52]
French:Méthode et système de communication pour l'enregistrement et la gestion d'images numériques[1997/52]
Examination procedure01.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
09.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2002Fee for grant paid
03.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.02.2001DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001
07.02.2001FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001
07.02.2001GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001
07.02.2001IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2646039  (GEOSTOCK [FR]) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH06133081  ;
 [A]JPH06268582
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940810), vol. 018, no. 428, Database accession no. (E - 1591), [A] 1,16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941220), vol. 018, no. 675, Database accession no. (E - 1648), [A] 1,16 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0624968
 WO9705738