blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0814611 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0814611



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 122
02.07.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.07.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.05.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.05.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
13.05.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
06.03.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
27.02.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
08.11.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.11.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.11.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
09.07.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
09.07.2001 Description Search / examination 3
09.07.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.03.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
09.03.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.02.2001 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
18.07.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.05.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
26.05.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.05.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
03.06.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.06.1997 Claims Search / examination 4
03.06.1997 Description Search / examination 15
03.06.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.1997 Drawings Search / examination 4
03.06.1997 Priority document Search / examination 26
03.06.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6