blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0814611
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59708043D 02.10.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE19624128 17.06.1996
DE59708043 03.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH1070631Global Dossier 10.03.1998A
Priority number Date
DE19624128 17.06.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0814611Global Dossier 28.08.2002B1
EP0814611 12.07.2000A3
EP0814611 29.12.1997A2
Priority number Date
DE19624128 17.06.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6038295 14.03.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19624128 17.06.1996