blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0814611

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure03.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.02.2001DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001
07.02.2001FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001
07.02.2001GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001
07.02.2001IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001
European patent granted28.08.2002
Opposition procedure30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit published on 20.08.2003 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:29.12.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:12.07.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.07.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7H 04N 7/14 A, 7H 04N 1/00 B
 
Event date:27.09.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000801
 
Event date:21.03.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
 
Event date:11.04.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:25.04.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010309
 
Event date:26.04.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE 8566
Code Expl.:-DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID
 
Event date:28.08.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:28.08.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:02.10.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59708043
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20021002
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:11.12.2002 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20021119
 
Event date:14.03.2003 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:20.08.2003 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20030530
 
Event date:09.06.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, , DE
Effective DATE:20110404
 
Event date:09.06.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS LLC, WILMINGTON, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, , DE
Effective DATE:20110404
 
Event date:09.06.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, , DE
Effective DATE:20110404
 
Event date:09.06.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNERS: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80333 MUENCHEN, DE; INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, 81669 MUENCHEN, DE
Effective DATE:20110404
 
Event date:20.04.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TQ
Code Expl.: PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE
Effective DATE:20120322
 
Event date:20.04.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TQ
Code Expl.: PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE
Effective DATE:20120322
 
Event date:03.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
 
Event date:03.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BOSCH JEHLE PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE
 
Event date:13.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:23.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS LLC, WILMINGTON, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, , DE
Effective DATE:20120703
 
Event date:23.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, , DE
Effective DATE:20120703
 
Event date:23.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, , DE
Effective DATE:20120703
 
Event date:23.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNERS: LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 85579 NEUBIBERG, DE; SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80333 MUENCHEN, DE
Effective DATE:20120703
 
Event date:29.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808
 
Event date:15.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R085 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE WITHDRAWN
 
Event date:05.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS LLC, WILMINGTON, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 85579 NEUBIBERG, DE
Effective DATE:20150126
 
Event date:05.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BOSCH JEHLE PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE
Effective DATE:20120703
 
Event date:05.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 85579 NEUBIBERG, DE
Effective DATE:20150126
 
Event date:12.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R085 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20150115
 
Event date:21.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R008 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT
 
Event date:21.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R039 59708043 DE
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION ACTION FILED
 
Event date:03.06.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R039 59708043 DE
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION ACTION FILED
Effective DATE:20150421
 
Event date:17.06.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:22.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BOSCH JEHLE PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE
 
Event date:22.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59708043 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: TLI COMMUNICATIONS LLC, WILMINGTON, DEL., US
 
Event date:18.12.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TQ
Code Expl.: PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE
Effective DATE:20151105
 
Event date:18.12.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE
Effective DATE:20151113
 
Event date:18.12.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:TLI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE
Effective DATE:20151105
 
Event date:27.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20160621
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20160627
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20160630
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20160628
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:14.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 59708043 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:14.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R040 59708043 DE
Code Expl.:+WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL
 
Event date:03.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59708043 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:28.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20170602
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20170602