Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0812720

EP0812720 - Vehicle with electric drive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/35]For all designated states
DEERE & COMPANY
One John Deere Place
Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US
Former [1997/51]For all designated states
DEERE & COMPANY
John Deere Road
Moline Illinois 61265-8098 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Weiss, Heinz
Karl-Kreuzer-Weg 28
64625 Bensheim / DE
[1997/51]
Representative(s)Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG
Global Intellectual Property Services
John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
Deere & Company European Office Patent Department
68140 Mannheim / DE
Former [1997/51]Feldmann, Bernhard , et al
DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department
68140 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date97109275.409.06.1997
[1997/51]
Priority number, dateDE199612373814.06.1996         Original published format: DE 19623738
[1997/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0812720
Date:17.12.1997
Language:DE
[1997/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0812720
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60L11/14, B60K6/02, B60K17/14
[1997/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB [1998/35]
Former [1997/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeug mit Elektroantrieb[1997/51]
English:Vehicle with electric drive[1997/51]
French:Véhicule avec entraînement électrique[1997/51]
Examination procedure31.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
01.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2001Fee for grant paid
08.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4319140  (PASCHKE RALPH W) [Y] 1-3,11,12,14,15 * column 8, line 40 - column 9, line 13 * * column 12, line 39 - line 50; figures 1,6 *;
 [Y]US5067932  (EDWARDS JONATHAN R [US]) [Y] 1-3,11,12,14,15 * column 4, line 7 - line 17 * * column 8, line 27 - line 38 * * column 9, line 44 - line 51; figure 2 *;
 [A]US1951089  (FIELDER REUBEN E) [A] 1 * page 1, line 16 - line 29; figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]DE4108647  (DEERE & CO [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *