Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0817428

EP0817428 - Traffic shaper with multiply queued virtual paths [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.11.2004  [2004/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd.
7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/02]For all designated states
Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd.
7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsunuma, Keiji
OKI Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd., 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1998/02]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/02]Betten & Resch
Reichenbachstrasse 19
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date97109511.211.06.1997
[1998/02]
Priority number, dateJP1996016884728.06.1996         Original published format: JP 16884796
[1998/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0817428
Date:07.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0817428
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0817428
Date:19.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56, H04Q11/04
[1998/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/41]
Former [1998/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verkehrsformer mit virtuellen Pfaden mit mehrfachen Warteschlangen[1998/02]
English:Traffic shaper with multiply queued virtual paths[1998/02]
French:Circuit de mise en forme de trafic aux voies virtuelles avec plusieurs files d'attente[1998/02]
Examination procedure05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
08.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2003Fee for grant paid
05.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]  FAN R ET AL, "EXPANDABLE ATOM SWITCH ARCHITECTURE (XATOM) FOR ATM LANS", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. -, page 402-409, XP000438948 [A] 1-24 * page 403, paragraph 2.1 * * page 404, column 1, line 20, paragraph 1 - line 41 * * page 404, column 2, line 1 - line 35 * * figures 3-5 *
 [A]  BONOMI F ET AL, "THE RATE-BASED FLOW CONTROL FRAMEWORK FOR THE AVAILABLE BIT RATE ATM SERVICE", IEEE NETWORK: THE MAGAZINE OF COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, XP000493487 [A] 1-24 * page 26, column 2, line 25 - line 37 * * page 26, column 2, line 58 - line 65 * * page 27, column 2, line 30 - line 67 * * page 29, column 2, line 16 - page 30, column 2, line 21 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.372653