blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0813958

EP0813958 - Rotary web printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2001 [2001/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Postfach 10 12 64
63012 Offenbach / DE
[1997/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Petersen, Godber
Zeppelinstrasse 22
86159 Augsburg / DE
02 / Fleischmann, Hans
Derchinger Strasse 43a
86165 Augsburg / DE
03 / Stamme, Rainer
Pirolstrasse 1b
86179 Augsburg / DE
04 / Schneider, Josef, Dr.
Lettenweg 1
86420 Diedorf-Lettenbach / DE
[1997/52]
Representative(s)Schober, Stefan
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Postfach 10 00 96
86135 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/52]Schober, Stefan
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Postfach 10 00 96
86135 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date97109621.913.06.1997
[1997/52]
Priority number, dateDE199612439519.06.1996         Original published format: DE 19624395
[1997/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0813958
Date:29.12.1997
Language:DE
[1997/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0813958
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.1997
ClassificationIPC:B41F13/00
[1997/52]
CPC:
B41F13/0024 (EP,US); B41P2217/15 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/37]
Former [1997/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine[1997/52]
English:Rotary web printing press[1997/52]
French:Machine à imprimer rotative pour bandes[1997/52]
Examination procedure18.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/34]
24.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.1999Fee for grant paid
07.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0667235  (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]);
 [A]US2962962  (GRAYDON SMITH);
 [A]US4991503  (MORNER ROBERT W [US]);
 [A]EP0469311  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]);
 [A]SU1546274
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 04, Database accession no. 91-028023, XP002041665 & SU1546274 A 19900228 (FOTON PRODN. ASOC) [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.