Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0813951

EP0813951 - Transfer ring for a pneumatic tyre or for a tyre belt [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE
12, Cours Sablon
F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex 01 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/52]For all designated states
COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE
12, Cours Sablon
F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex 01 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Morteyrol, Jean-Louis
1, rue des Caves
63118 Cebazat / FR
[1997/52]
Representative(s)Dequire, Philippe Jean-Marie Denis
Manufacture Française des
Pneumatiques Michelin
CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux
23, place des Carmes-Déchaux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/52]Dequire, Philippe Jean-Marie Denis
Michelin & Cie, Service SGD/LG/PI-LAD
63040 Clermont Ferrand Cedex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date97109650.813.06.1997
[1997/52]
Priority number, dateFR1996000772119.06.1996         Original published format: FR 9607721
[1997/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0813951
Date:29.12.1997
Language:FR
[1997/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0813951
Date:04.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:B29D30/26
[1997/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/52]
TitleGerman:Übertragungsring für Luftreifen oder für Luftreifengürtel[1997/52]
English:Transfer ring for a pneumatic tyre or for a tyre belt[1997/52]
French:Anneau de transfert d'une enveloppe de pneumatique ou d'une ceinture d'enveloppe de pneumatique[1997/52]
Examination procedure29.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/35]
03.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2002Fee for grant paid
24.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[DYA]GB2092100  (VMI EPE HOLLAND) [DY] 21 * page 2, line 25 - line 36; figures 2,3 * * page 2, line 58 - line 104; figures 4-6 * [A] 2-5,8-14,17-20;
 [YA]EP0104338  (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]) [Y] 21 * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 11; figures 1-3,5 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 5 * [A] 13;
 [YA]FR2292579  (GEN TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]) [Y] 21 * page 31, line 22 - page 33, line 9; figures 13,17 * * page 36, line 1 - line 7 * [A] 1,11;
 [YA]DE2109564  (FESTO MASCHF STOLL G) [Y] 21 * the whole document * [A] 12,13;
 [A]EP0613767  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5,8,14,15,17,19 * column 9, line 50 - column 11, line 16; figures 8-12 *;
 [A]US4608219  (SINGH ANAND P [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 6; figures 2,4,6 *