Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0814135

EP0814135 - Emulsion ink for stencil printing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Riso Kagaku Corporation
2-20-15, Shinbashi, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/52]For all designated states
RISO KAGAKU CORPORATION
2-20-15, Shimbashi, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okuda, Sadanao, c/o Riso Kagaku Corporation
R&D Center, 1339-2, Wakaguri Nishikanda, Amimachi
Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken, 300-03 / JP
02 / Ishikawa, Masato, c/o Riso Kagaku Corporation
R&D Center, 1339-2, Wakaguri Nishikanda, Amimachi
Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken, 300-03 / JP
03 / Suzuki, Takashi, c/o Riso Kagaku Corporation
R&D Center, 1339-2, Wakaguri Nishikanda, Amimachi
Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken, 300-03 / JP
04 / Wakayama, Takahiro, c/o Riso Kagaku Corporation
R&D Center, 1339-2, Wakaguri Nishikanda, Amimachi
Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken, 300-03 / JP
05 / Hayashi, Yoshihiro, c/o Riso Kagaku Corporation
R&D Center, 1339-2, Wakaguri Nishikanda, Amimachi
Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken, 300-03 / JP
[1997/52]
Representative(s)Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/52]WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date97109977.518.06.1997
[1997/52]
Priority number, dateJP1996017751818.06.1996         Original published format: JP 17751896
[1997/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0814135
Date:29.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0814135
Date:20.05.1998
[1998/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0814135
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/02
[1997/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/05]
Former [1997/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Emulsionstinte für den Schablonendruck[1997/52]
English:Emulsion ink for stencil printing[1997/52]
French:Encre en émulsion pour l'impression par stencil[1997/52]
Examination procedure15.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/52]
17.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.1999Fee for grant paid
21.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US5512622  (TISE FRANK P [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 5, lines 40-42; claims 1,8,36,40 *;
 [E]EP0786502  (RISO KAGAKU CORP [JP]) [E] 1-6 * page 3, lines 34-36 * * page 4, line 60 - page 5, line 45 * * claim 1 *;
 [X]FR2100449  (DICK CO AB) [X] 1,2,4 * claims 1,3 *