EP0813935 - Paper cutting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeharu, Kirikoshi c/o NEC Engineering, Ltd., 18-21, Shibaura 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kouichi, Hattori 3-3-402, Shogen 9-chome, Izumi-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110240.5 | 23.06.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | JP19960161499 | 21.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16149996 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0813935 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0813935 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/20, B26D1/00, B41J11/70 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
B26D1/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/37] |
Former [1997/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Papierschneider | [1997/52] | English: | Paper cutting device | [1997/52] | French: | Dispositif de coupe pour papier | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPH07124892 (NEC ENG LTD.) [DY] 1-8,11 * figure - *; | [Y]GB2257084 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [Y] 1-8,11 * examples 2,3 *; | [A]GB2289430 (NEC CORP.) [A] 8 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP0579477 (NEC CORP.) [A] 8,9 * figure 5 *; | [A]DE2007689 (KK RIKOH) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2446574 (GRANGER) [A] 7 * figures 8-10,15-17 *; | [A]US5322001 (BODA) [A] 11 * figure 5; claim 5 * |