EP0815777 - Arm rest for office chairs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dauphin Entwicklungs- u. Beteiligungs GmbH Industriestrasse 11 91217 Hersbruck / DE | [2003/18] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states Dauphin Entwicklungs- u. Beteiligungs-GmbH Erkelsdorfer Strasse 8 92259 Neukirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uhlenbrock, Johannes An der Werse 5 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Hübner, Gerd, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Hübner, Gerd, Dipl.-Phys., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110265.2 | 24.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | DE1996211267U | 01.07.1996 Original published format: DE 29611267 U | [1998/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0815777 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0815777 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0815777 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/03, A47C7/54 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
A47C1/0308 (EP,US);
A47C1/0303 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/02] | A47C1/03 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Armlehne für Bürostühle | [1998/02] | English: | Arm rest for office chairs | [1998/02] | French: | Appuie-bras pour chaises de bureau | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 27.07.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, GR, IE, LU, MC | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 29.01.2004 | SE | 29.01.2004 | PT | 29.03.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/41] | DK | 29.01.2004 | |
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 29.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1706634 (SEILS CHRISTIAN J) [A] 6-8* sentences 96-110; figure 2 *; | [XA]US4277102 (AARAS ARNE, et al) [X] 1-5,9 * column 2, lines 33-36 * * column 3, lines 36-38,62-65; figures 1,4; claim 1 * [A] 6-8 |