blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0816773

EP0816773 - Air outlet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schako Klima Luft Ferdinand Schad KG
Zweigniederlassung Kolbingen, Steigstrasse 25-27
78600 Kolbingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
Schako Klima Luft Ferdinand Schad KG
Zweigniederlassung Kolbingen, Steigstrasse 25-27
78600 Kolbingen / DE
Former [1998/02]For all designated states
SCHAKO METALLWARENFABRIK FERDINAND SCHAD KG
Zweigniederlassung Kolbingen
78600 Kolbingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Müller, Gottfried
Haldenstrasse 12
78600 Kolbingen / DE
[1998/02]
Representative(s)Weiss, Peter, et al
Dr. Weiss & Arat
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Weiss, Peter, et al
Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
Former [2003/35]Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer. nat., et al
Dr. Weiss, Weiss & Brecht Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
Former [1998/02]Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer. nat.
Patentanwalt, Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
Application number, filing date97110660.430.06.1997
[1998/02]
Priority number, dateDE199612622029.06.1996         Original published format: DE 19626220
[1998/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0816773
Date:07.01.1998
Language:DE
[1998/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0816773
Date:22.03.2000
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0816773
Date:19.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:F24F13/068
[1998/02]
CPC:
F24F13/06 (EP); F24F13/068 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT [2000/48]
Former [1998/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Luftauslass[1998/02]
English:Air outlet[1998/02]
French:Sortie d'air[1998/02]
Examination procedure06.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/23]
04.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2003Fee for grant paid
13.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
25.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR19.02.2004
PT19.04.2004
[2008/07]
Former [2004/33]GR19.02.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1251495  (ALLIED THERMAL CORPORATION) [X] 1 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 40; figures 3-5 *;
 [XA]US2821898  (KENNEDY WALTER W) [X] 1 * column 7, line 30 - line 60; figure 15 * [A] 13;
 [Y]DE2237489  (LUFT U KAELTETECHNIK VEB K) [Y] 2-8,10-12 * page 6 - page 7; figure - *;
 [XY]EP0415139  (KRANTZ H GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-8,10-12;
 [A]EP0503458  (SCHAKO METALLWARENFABRIK [DE]) [A] 1-13* page 3, line 22 - line 39; figures 3,4 *
by applicantDE8713209U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.