blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0829776

EP0829776 - Fixing unit for use in an electrophotographic printing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.06.2002
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.07.2002  [2002/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakamura, Teruo
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
[1998/12]
Representative(s)von Fischern, Bernhard, et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Hoffmann - Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date97111165.303.07.1997
[1998/12]
Priority number, dateJP1996024311213.09.1996         Original published format: JP 24311296
[1998/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0829776
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.1998
ClassificationIPC:G03G15/20, G03G15/01
[1998/12]
CPC:
G03G15/20 (KR); G03G15/2064 (EP); G03G15/6591 (EP);
G03G2215/00497 (EP); G03G2215/2074 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/49]
Former [1998/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fixiereinheit für ein elektrophotographisches Druckgerät[1998/12]
English:Fixing unit for use in an electrophotographic printing apparatus[1998/12]
French:Unité de fixage pour un appareil à imprimer électrophotographique[1998/12]
Examination procedure25.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/21]
04.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/31]
21.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0580672  ;
 [X]JPH02109064  ;
 [X]JPH02114275  ;
 [X]JPH04313784  ;
 [A]US5138392  (KINOSHITA NAOYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [D]JPH047564  (MINOLTA CAMERA KK);
 [A]EP0560304  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0532344  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930803), vol. 017, no. 416, Database accession no. (P - 1584), & JP05080672 A 19930402 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900716), vol. 014, no. 329, Database accession no. (P - 1076), & JP02109064 A 19900420 (KONICA CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900720), vol. 014, no. 337, Database accession no. (P - 1079), & JP02114275 A 19900426 (KONICA CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930322), vol. 017, no. 138, Database accession no. (P - 1505), & JP04313784 A 19921105 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.