blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0825058

EP0825058 - Method for gear shift of a double clutch gearbox and double clutch transmission with synchronizing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/09]Method for gear shift of a doulble clutch gearbox and doulble clutch transmission with synchronizing device
[2002/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/09]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ludanek, Harald, Dr.
Meisenweg 1
38547 Calberlah / DE
02 / Cappelmann, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing.
Heideweg 4
38176 Wendeburg-Neubrück / DE
03 / Haack, Reinhold, Dipl.-Ing.
Zeppelinstrasse 6
38106 Braunschweig / DE
[1998/09]
Application number, filing date97111397.205.07.1997
[1998/09]
Priority number, dateDE199613198308.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19631983
[1998/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0825058
Date:25.02.1998
Language:DE
[1998/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0825058
Date:09.09.1998
[1998/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0825058
Date:22.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.1998
ClassificationIPC:B60K41/22, F16H61/04
[1998/09]
CPC:
F16H61/688 (EP,US); F16H61/0403 (EP,US); F16H2061/0411 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0425 (EP,US); F16H2306/14 (EP,US); F16H2306/44 (EP,US);
F16H2306/48 (EP,US); F16H2306/52 (EP,US); F16H3/006 (EP,US);
F16H3/089 (EP,US); Y10T74/19233 (EP,US); Y10T74/19284 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/21]
Former [1998/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Schalten eines Doppelkupplungsgetriebes und Doppelkupplungsgetriebe mit Synchronisiereinrichtung[1998/09]
English:Method for gear shift of a double clutch gearbox and double clutch transmission with synchronizing device[2002/17]
French:Procédé de changement de vitesses d'une boîte de vitesses à double embrayage et transmission à double embrayage avec dispositif de synchronisation[1998/09]
Former [1998/09]Method for gear shift of a doulble clutch gearbox and doulble clutch transmission with synchronizing device
Examination procedure09.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/18]
28.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2002Fee for grant paid
11.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB22.01.2003
IT22.01.2003
ES30.07.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2004/22]GB22.01.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/04]ES30.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0288779  (FORD WERKE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 21 * [A] 2,11,12;
 [XA]US4527678  (PIERCE STANLEY L [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10,19 * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 10 * [A] 2,11,12;
 [A]DE3527401  (VOITH GMBH J M [DE], et al) [A] 3-6,8,16,19 * page 4, line 66 - page 5, line 10 *;
 [A]DE4436526  (FRANKE RUDOLF PROF DR [DE]) [A] 3,6,15,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0042677  (AUTOMOTIVE PROD PLC [GB]) [A] 14 * page 7, line 19 - line 23 *;
 [A]EP0435374  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 2 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4031851  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.