Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0828267

EP0828267 - Circuit breaker with forced opening [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heinrich Kopp AG
Alzenauer Strasse 66-72
D-63796 Kahl / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/11]For all designated states
HEINRICH KOPP AG
Alzenauer Strasse 66-72
D-63796 Kahl / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Flohr, Peter
Berliner Platz 4
63796 Kahl am Main / DE
[1998/11]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/11]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Application number, filing date97111531.608.07.1997
[1998/11]
Priority number, dateDE199613246212.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19632462
[1998/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0828267
Date:11.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0828267
Date:23.12.1998
[1998/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828267
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01H3/00
[1998/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/35]
Former [1998/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schutzschalter mit Zwangstrennung[1998/11]
English:Circuit breaker with forced opening[1998/11]
French:Disjoncteur avec commande d'ouverture positive[1998/11]
Examination procedure09.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/18]
31.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1999Fee for grant paid
10.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3823098  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4337254  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *