Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0820203

EP0820203 - Method and apparatus for providing an efficient use of telecommunication network resources [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.08.2001 [2001/32]
22.06.2001First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1998/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Bergholm, Joseph O.
23 Galloping Hill Circle
Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US
02 / Davis, John Michael
105 Hudson Avenue
Red Bank, New Jersey 07701 / US
03 / Lee, Shui Yee
24 East Lawn Drive
Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US
04 / Nadji, Behzad
176 Fox Hill Drive
Little Silver, New Jersey 07739 / US
05 / Ting, Peter Di-Hsian
18 East Lawn Drive
Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US
[1998/04]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Former [1998/04]KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date97112051.415.07.1997
[1998/04]
Priority number, dateUS1996068094315.07.1996         Original published format: US 680943
[1998/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0820203
Date:21.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0820203
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q3/00, H04M3/42, H04M3/22
[1998/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/01]
Former [1998/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur effizienten Nutzung von Fernmeldenetzressourcen[1998/04]
English:Method and apparatus for providing an efficient use of telecommunication network resources[1998/04]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour l'usage efficace des ressources d'un réseau de télécommunication[1998/04]
Examination procedure07.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
13.06.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/32]
21.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US5491742  (HARPER MYRON E [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-16 * column 2, line 9 - column 9, line 26 * * column 12, line 61 - column 14, line 44 *;
 [XA]  WILSON S, "SERVICE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS: SUPPORTING THE CUSTOMER INTERFACE", BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENGINEERING,GB,BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENGINEERING. LONDON, (19940401), vol. 13, no. PART 01, ISSN 0262-401X, pages 20 - 23, XP000446926 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-19
 [A]  MASAYOSHI EJIRI ET AL, "OPERATION SYSTEMS ARCHITECTURE", NTT REVIEW,JP,TELECOMMUNICATIONS ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, (19910301), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 76 - 80, XP000230757 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *