Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0838656

EP0838656 - Guided missile with ram jet engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.02.2003  [2003/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LFK Lenkflugkörpersysteme GmbH
Postfach 80 11 49
81663 München / DE
[1999/06]
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
Daimler-Benz Aerospace Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 80 11 09
81663 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hetzer, Walter, Dipl.-Ing.
Schwablweg 5
85630 Grasbrunn / DE
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Hummel, Adam
Airbus Defence and Space GmbH
Patentabteilung
81663 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Hummel, Adam
EADS Deutschland GmbH LG-PM - Patente Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
Application number, filing date97114018.114.08.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateDE199613584704.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19635847
[1998/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0838656
Date:29.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0838656
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0838656
Date:13.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F42B10/64
[1998/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/39]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lenkflugkörper mit Staustrahlantrieb[1998/18]
English:Guided missile with ram jet engine[1998/18]
French:Missile guidé à statoréacteur[1998/18]
Examination procedure21.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/25]
27.10.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
09.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
09.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.12.2001Fee for grant paid
07.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)14.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0636852  (DIEHL GMBH & CO) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 45 - column 5, line 3; figure - *;
 [A]DE4135557  (DIEHL GMBH & CO) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 30; figure - *;
 [A]DE3441533  (DIEHL GMBH & CO) [A] 1-8 * page 4, line 31 - page 6, line 31; figure . *;
 [A]US4560121  (TERP LESLIE S) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 65; figure . *;
 [A]US4327886  (BELL ALFRED J ET AL) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 67 - column 6, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]US3154015  (MULLER) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 37 - column 8, line 34; figure - *