blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0824888

EP0824888 - Mat in the form of an insert or article for sanitary appliances [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2001
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 15.12.2004  [2004/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RIDDER GMBH
Postfach 1247
56372 Nassau/Lahn / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/09]For all designated states
Ridder GmbH
Postfach 1247
56372 Nassau/Lahn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hübinger, Johannes
Mühlenweg 8
56324 Staudt / DE
02 / Ridder, Jürgen
Obernhofer Strasse 47
56377 Nassau / DE
[1998/09]
Representative(s)Hufnagel, Walter
Bad Brückenauer Strasse 6
90427 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/09]Hufnagel, Walter, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing.
Bad Brückenauer Strasse 6
90427 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date97114095.915.08.1997
[1998/09]
Priority number, dateDE1996214317U20.08.1996         Original published format: DE 29614317 U
[1998/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0824888
Date:25.02.1998
Language:DE
[1998/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0824888
Date:10.06.1998
[1998/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0824888
Date:11.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.1998
ClassificationIPC:A47K3/00, B29C45/14
[1998/09]
CPC:
B29C45/14311 (EP,US); A47K3/002 (EP,US); B29C45/1418 (EP,US);
B29C45/14344 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [1999/08]
Former [1998/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Matte in Form einer Einlage oder Vorlage für sanitäre Einrichtungen[1998/09]
English:Mat in the form of an insert or article for sanitary appliances[1998/09]
French:Tapis sous forme d'un insert ou article pour installations sanitaires[1998/09]
Examination procedure02.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/05]
08.06.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
30.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
21.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2000Fee for grant paid
05.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES11.10.2000
NL11.10.2000
PT11.01.2001
GR12.01.2001
[2004/51]
Former [2003/09]ES11.10.2000
NL11.10.2000
PT11.01.2001
Former [2002/27]ES11.10.2000
PT11.01.2001
Former [2002/11]PT11.01.2001
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH02150321  ;
 [A]GB884468  (SCHMIDT MAX) [A] 1,19 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE3028661  (HAEFELE ISOKLEPA WERK [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [XAY]DE3303993  (HAEFELE ISOKLEPA WERK [DE]) [X] 19,20 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 1; figure - * [A] 1,2 [Y] 21,22;
 [A]US4491556  (FUJII HIROMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1,19* column A; figure - *;
 [A]GB2247168  (HOLZAPFEL & CO KG GEB [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900827), vol. 14, no. 395, Database accession no. (M - 1016), & JP02150321 A 19900608 (KONBI KK) [Y] 21,22 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.