EP0835705 - Method and apparatus for production of controlled solidified precision casting by centrifugal casting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALD Vacuum Technologies Aktiengesellschaft Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 35 63450 Hanau / DE | For all designated states W.C. Heraeus GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states ALD Vacuum Technologies AG Wilhelm-Rohn-Str. 35 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
For all designated states W.C. Heraeus GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | |||
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states ALD Vacuum Technologies GmbH Rückinger Strasse 12 63526 Erlensee / DE | ||
For all designated states W.C. Heraeus GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | |||
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states ALD Vacuum Technologies GmbH Rückinger Strasse 12 63526 Erlensee / DE | ||
For all designated states W.C. Heraeus GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12 - 14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choudhury, Alok, Dr. Virchowstrasse 2 66346 Püttlingen / DE | 02 /
Scholz, Harald Bleiweissstrasse 13 60599 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
Blum, Matthias, Dr. Fürthwiese 19 63654 Büdingen / DE | 04 /
Jarczyk, Georg Albert-Schweizer-strasse 20 63538 Grosskrotzenburg / DE | 05 /
Gorywoda, Marek, Dr. Frankfurter Landstrasse 40a 63452 Hanau am Main / DE | 06 /
Lupton, David Francis, Dr. Am Rain 8 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Zapfe, Hans Patentanwalt Postfach 20 01 51 63136 Heusenstamm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Zapfe, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 20 01 51 63136 Heusenstamm / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114168.4 | 16.08.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | DE1996139514 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19639514 | [1998/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835705 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835705 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B22D13/04, B22D27/04 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
B22D13/04 (EP,US);
B22D27/003 (EP,US);
B22D27/045 (EP,US);
B22D27/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/01] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von gesteuert erstarrten Präzisionsgussteilen durch Schleudergiessen | [1998/16] | English: | Method and apparatus for production of controlled solidified precision casting by centrifugal casting | [1998/16] | French: | Procédé et dispositif permettant une solidification contrôlée de pièces coulées de précision fabriqué par le moulage rotatif | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 16.10.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 22.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.11.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE596674 (OSNABRUECKER KUPFER UND DRAHT) [A] 1,6* claim 1 *; | [A]DE2427098 (SULZER AG) [A] 1 * column 2, line 6 - line 55 * * column 3, line 40 - line 55 * * figure 2 *; | [DAY]DE4420138 (LEYBOLD DURFERRIT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 15 * * column 8, line 3 - line 17 * * figure 6 * [Y] 6,9,11,13; | [DAY]DE19505689 (ALD VACUUM TECHN GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-3,5 * column 1, line 15 - line 40 * * column 4, line 22 - line 67 * * column 6, line 4 - column 8, line 35 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 6,9,11,13 |