Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0826943

EP0826943 - Assembly for a heat exchanger comprising an aluminium based manifold and tubes and process for manufacturing such an assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/10]Aluminium based collar manifold,for heat exchanger,in particular for automotive vehicle
[2002/45]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.12.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR S.A.
8, rue Louis-Lormand
78321 La Verrière / FR
[2003/19]
Former [1998/10]For all designated states
VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR
8, rue Louis-Lormand
78321 La Verrière / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Letrange, Frédéric
23 rue St. Geneviève
92000 Nanterre / FR
02 / Martins, Carlos
10 rue de la Moutière
78490 Montfort L'Amaury / FR
[1998/10]
Representative(s)Brillet de Candé, Rémi , et al
Valeo Systèmes Thermiques
Z.A. L'Agiot
8, rue Louis Lormand
CS 80517 - La Verrière
78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/08]Rolland, Jean-Christophe , et al
Valeo Thérmique Moteur, Propriété Industrielle, 8, rue Louis-Lormand
78321 La Verrière / FR
Former [2001/03]Plaçais, Jean-Yves , et al
Cabinet Netter, 40, rue Vignon
75009 Paris / FR
Former [1998/10]Gamonal, Didier , et al
Valeo Management Services, Propriété Industrielle, 2, rue André Boulle - B.P. 150
94017 Créteil / FR
Application number, filing date97114201.318.08.1997
[1998/10]
Priority number, dateFR1996001057329.08.1996         Original published format: FR 9610573
[1998/10]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0826943
Date:04.03.1998
Language:FR
[1998/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0826943
Date:07.05.2003
Language:FR
[2003/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:F28F9/18
[1998/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/02]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  GB,  IT,  LI,  SE 
Former [1998/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  LI 
Former [1998/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anordnung für einen Wärmetauscher bestehend aus einem Verteiler auf Aluminiumbasis und Rohren und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer solchen Anordnung[2002/45]
English:Assembly for a heat exchanger comprising an aluminium based manifold and tubes and process for manufacturing such an assembly[2002/45]
French:Assemblage d'un collecteur à base d'aluminium et de tubes pour échangeur de chaleur et procédé de fabrication d'un tel assemblage[2002/45]
Former [1998/10]Auf Aluminiumbasis Kragenverteiler, für Wärmetauscher, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeug
Former [1998/10]Aluminium based collar manifold,for heat exchanger,in particular for automotive vehicle
Former [1998/10]Collecteur à collets, à base d'aluminium, pour échangeur de chaleur, notamment de véhicule automobile
Examination procedure31.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/44]
05.09.1998Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.01.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
25.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2003Fee for grant paid
16.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.02.2004  18.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstr. 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
 [2015/39]
Former [2015/33]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2004  18.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstr. 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Grauel, Andreas
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Presselstraße 10
70191 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2012/03]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2004  18.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstr. 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Grauel, Andreas
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Presselstrasse 10
70191 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2008/34]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2004  18.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstr. 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2004/15]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2004  18.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstr. 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael, Dr.
Zweibrückenstrasse 2
80331 München / DE
15.03.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.11.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.12.2004Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M10)
31.10.2005Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
02.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
04.08.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.08.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.12.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition02.10.2015Appeal received No.  T1971/15
03.12.2015Statement of grounds filed
26.09.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/39]
19.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
19.11.2019Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
17.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.10.1998AT   M01   Not yet paid
30.10.1998BE   M01   Not yet paid
30.10.1998CH   M01   Not yet paid
30.10.1998DK   M01   Not yet paid
30.10.1998FI   M01   Not yet paid
30.10.1998FR   M01   Not yet paid
30.10.1998GR   M01   Not yet paid
30.10.1998IE   M01   Not yet paid
30.10.1998LU   M01   Not yet paid
30.10.1998MC   M01   Not yet paid
30.10.1998NL   M01   Not yet paid
30.10.1998PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT07.05.2003
SE07.08.2003
GB17.08.2017
ES19.08.2017
[2018/39]
Former [2018/01]IT07.05.2003
SE07.08.2003
GB17.08.2017
Former [2008/07]IT07.05.2003
SE07.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE07.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3316960  (LEIPZIG BLECHVERFORMUNG) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH07305992  (ZEXEL CORP) [A] 1,9 * figures 6,11 *;
 [A]US4234041  (MELNYK WILLIAM) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4129573  (BEHR GMBH & CO) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2538526  (CHAUSSON USINES SA) [A] 1 * page 2, line 30 - line 33; figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2231932  (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR) [A] 1