Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0827850

EP0827850 - Level controlling valve for keeping constant automatically the height of a commercial vehicle with pneumatic suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haldex Brake Products GmbH
Eppelheimer Str. 76
69123 Heidelberg / DE
[2000/20]
Former [1998/48]For all designated states
Haldex Brake Products GmbH & Co. KG
Eppelheimer Strasse 76
69123 Heidelberg / DE
Former [1998/11]For all designated states
GRAU GMBH
Eppelheimer Strasse 76
D-69123 Heidelberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Blanz, Roland
Emigtalweg 33
69253 Heiligkreuzsteinach / DE
[1998/11]
Representative(s)REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1
37073 Göttingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Rehberg Hüppe + Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62
37021 Göttingen / DE
Former [1998/11]Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe
Am Kirschberge 22
37085 Göttingen / DE
Application number, filing date97114305.219.08.1997
[1998/11]
Priority number, dateDE199613600205.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19636002
[1998/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0827850
Date:11.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0827850
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60G17/056
[1998/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/48]
Former [1998/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Niveauregelventil zum selbsttätigen Konstanthalten der Fahrzeughöhe eines Nutzfahrzeuges mit Luftfederung[1998/11]
English:Level controlling valve for keeping constant automatically the height of a commercial vehicle with pneumatic suspension[1998/11]
French:Soupape de régulation de niveau pour maintenir constante automatiquement la hauteur d'un véhicule utilitaire à suspension pneumatique[1998/11]
Examination procedure24.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/18]
16.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2000Fee for grant paid
21.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3716436  (GRAUBREMSE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE1966636  (WESTINGHOUSE BREMSEN APPARATE) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE4416280  (GRAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE3446810  (GRAUBREMSE GMBH) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [AD]DE2318535  (KNORR BREMSE GMBH) [AD] 1 * figure - *;
 [PAD]DE19607619  (GRAU GMBH [DE]) [PAD] 1,3 * the whole document *