Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0827707

EP0827707 - Pyramidal paper filter inlay [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.01.2001 [2001/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MELITTA HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft
Ringstrasse 99
D-32427 Minden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/11]For all designated states
MELITTA HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft
Ringstrasse 99
D-32427 Minden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kefenbaum, Martin
Nordstrasse 23
45657 Recklinghausen / DE
02 / Jones, Frank Ronald
Kronenbrink 11
32457 Porta Westfalica / DE
[1998/11]
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/11]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
33613 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date97114329.220.08.1997
[1998/11]
Priority number, dateDE1996215669U09.09.1996         Original published format: DE 29615669 U
[1998/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0827707
Date:11.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0827707
Date:15.04.1998
[1998/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0827707
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/08
[1998/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/06]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  IT,  LI,  NL,  SE 
Former [1998/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Pyramidenartiger Filterpapiereinsatz[1998/11]
English:Pyramidal paper filter inlay[1998/11]
French:Papier filtre pyramidal[1998/11]
Examination procedure23.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/26]
13.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.1999Fee for grant paid
15.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]LU67526  (MELITTA-WERKE BENTZ & SOHN) [A] 1,3,6 * page 4, paragraph 4; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0268847  (JACOBS SUCHARD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6 * figures 7A-8; claims 2-5 *;
 [A]US3800954  (LAMPCOV H) [A] 1 * column 3, line 45 - line 52; figures 2,8 *;
 [A]US4220541  (CHANGE SOO-DUCK [SE]) [A] 6 * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 21; figure 4 *