Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0826764

EP0826764 - Perfuming compositions comprising substituted 2-acetylbenzofuranes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/10]Use of substituted 2-acetylbenzofuranes as perfuming agents
[2002/28]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.02.2004  [2004/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH
Postfach 12 53
37601 Holzminden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]For all designated states
HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH
Postfach 12 53
D-37601 Holzminden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sonnenberg, Steffen, Dr.
Weissdornweg 10
37603 Holzminden / DE
02 / Wörner, Peter
Schratweg 3
37603 Holzminden / DE
03 / Harder, Ulrich, Dr.
Altendorfer Strasse 3
37603 Holzminden / DE
[1998/10]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/21]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Former [1998/10]Petrovicki, Wolfgang, Dr. , et al
Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date97114337.520.08.1997
[1998/10]
Priority number, dateDE199613565503.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19635655
[1998/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0826764
Date:04.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0826764
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0826764
Date:26.02.2003
Language:DE
[2003/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C11B9/00, A61K7/46
[1998/10]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/52]
Former [1998/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Riechstoffkompositionen enthaltend substituierte 2-Acetylbenzofurane[2002/28]
English:Perfuming compositions comprising substituted 2-acetylbenzofuranes[2002/28]
French:Compositions parfumantes contenant des 2-acétylbenzofuranes substitués[2002/34]
Former [1998/10]Verwendung substituierter 2-Acetylbenzofurane als Riechstoffe
Former [1998/10]Use of substituted 2-acetylbenzofuranes as perfuming agents
Former [1998/10]Utilisation de 2-acétylbenzofuranes comme agents parfumants
Examination procedure19.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
06.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2002Fee for grant paid
20.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3917871  (WINTER MAX, et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0041122  (HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9530667  (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [Y]FR2634203  (INST RECH CONTROLES TECHN [FR]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 19 *;
 [A]GB1063158  (MERCK AG E) [A] 1 * page 1, line 12 - line 26 * * page 2, line 17 - line 25 *