Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0827785

EP0827785 - Process for making protecting layers on flat shaped products made of titanium zinc [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.07.2007
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Revocation of patentpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rheinzink GmbH & Co. KG
Bahnhofstrasse 90
45711 Datteln / DE
[2005/25]
Former [1998/11]For all designated states
RHEINZINK GMBH
Bahnhofstrasse 90
45711 Datteln / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stradmann, Adolf
Dahlstrasse 47
45711 Datteln / DE
02 / Schönnenbeck, Marianne, Dr.
Hattinger Strasse 90
44789 Bochum / DE
[1998/11]
Representative(s)Hoffmeister, Helmut
Patentanwalt
Goldstrasse 36
48147 Münster / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/40]Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36
48147 Münster / DE
Former [1999/47]Revesz, Veronika
Bockenheimer Landstrasse 73-77
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1998/21]Häring, Martin
c/o LURGI SERVICE GmbH, MG Patente und Marken, S-LA, Lurgiallee 5
60295 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date97114344.120.08.1997
[1998/11]
Priority number, dateDE199613637009.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19636370
[1998/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0827785
Date:11.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0827785
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0827785
Date:26.02.2003
Language:DE
[2003/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B05D7/14, B05D7/00, C23C22/53
[2000/03]
Former International [1998/11]B05D7/14
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [2000/46]
Former [2000/38](deleted) 
Former [1998/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Schutzschichten auf Flacherzeugnissen aus Titanzink[1998/11]
English:Process for making protecting layers on flat shaped products made of titanium zinc[1998/11]
French:Procédé pour faire une couche de protection sur des tôles de zinc au titane[1998/11]
Examination procedure18.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
27.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2002Fee for grant paid
25.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.11.2003   
Umicore
Rue du Marais 31
1000 Bruxelles / BE
Opponent's representative
Pilate, André
Umicore
RDI Patent Department
Watertorenstraat 33
2250 Olen / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/03]
Opponent(s)01  21.11.2003   
Umicore
Rue du Marais 31
1000 Bruxelles / BE
Opponent's representative
Pilate, André
Umicore Research Patent Department Kasteelstraat 7
B-2250 Olen / BE
09.01.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.05.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.05.2004Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2004Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
29.03.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
26.04.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/32]
Appeal following opposition10.05.2005Appeal received No.  T0653/05
14.07.2005Statement of grounds filed
26.04.2007Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
26.04.2007Date of oral proceedings
03.05.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.09.2000BE   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
01.09.2000CH   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
01.09.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
01.09.2000DK   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
01.09.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
01.09.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
01.09.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
01.09.2000LU   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
01.09.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.09.2000M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE2757592  (RHEINISCHES ZINKWALZWERK GMBH) [DA] 1 * the whole document *