Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0826701

EP0826701 - Isobutylene polymers having acrylic functionality [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]For all designated states
DOW CORNING CORPORATION
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Saxena, Anil Kumar
2622 Abott Road, Apt. No. 6
Midland, Michigan 48640 / US
02 / Suzuki, Toshio
1209 Sterling Court
Midland, Michigan 48640 / US
[1998/10]
Representative(s)polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date97114356.520.08.1997
[1998/10]
Priority number, dateUS1996070807030.08.1996         Original published format: US 708070
[1998/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0826701
Date:04.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0826701
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:C08F8/42
[1998/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/47]
Former [1998/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Isobutylenpolymere mit Acrylfunktionsfähigkeit[1998/10]
English:Isobutylene polymers having acrylic functionality[1998/10]
French:Polymères d'isobutylène présentant une fonctionnalité acrylique[1998/10]
Examination procedure08.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/28]
31.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2000Fee for grant paid
07.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0252372  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * page 10, line 14 - page 15, line 32 * * page 16, line 5 - line 7; claims 1-13 *;
 [Y]EP0560131  (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * page 5, line 29 - line 40 * * page 7, line 6 - line 9; claims 1-9 *;
 [Y]FR1578807  (DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY) [Y] 1-7 * page 5 * * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]GB2192891  (BP CHEM INT LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0134678  (LOCTITE CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]US4722975  (ITOH KUNIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-7 *;
 [A]EP0397499  (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * claims 1-17 *;
 [A]EP0320259  (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 13; claims 1-4 *;
 [DA]EP0264214  (DOW CORNING [US]) [DA] 1 * claims 1-11 *