blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0825726 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0825726



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 77
22.08.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
24.07.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.07.2002 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.07.2002 Closing of application Search / examination 3
19.06.2002 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
02.10.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.07.2001 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.06.2001 General enquiry Search / examination 1
16.05.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.03.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
04.01.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.09.1999 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
19.08.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
20.07.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.09.1997 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
20.08.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.08.1997 Claims Search / examination 7
20.08.1997 Description Search / examination 8
20.08.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.08.1997 Drawings Search / examination 2
20.08.1997 Priority document Search / examination 31
20.08.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6