blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0825726


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.07.2002 Withdrawal of application published on  21.08.2002  [2002/34]
16.08.2001 Renewal fee
01.12.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  17.01.2001 [2001/03]
17.08.2000 Renewal fee
30.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  16.08.2000 [2000/33]
24.03.2000 Publication of search report published on  10.05.2000 [2000/19]
18.08.1999 Renewal fee
14.08.1998 Change - representative published on  30.09.1998 [1998/40]
09.01.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.02.1998 [1998/09]