Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0825726

EP0825726 - Method for providing high-speed packet data services for a wireless system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.07.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.08.2002  [2002/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1998/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Javitt, Joel I.
194 Wilder Street
Hillside, N.J. 07205 / US
02 / Wronka, Edward
110 Irving Place
Basking Ridge, N.J. 07920 / US
[1998/09]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Former [1998/09]KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date97114398.720.08.1997
[1998/09]
Priority number, dateUS1996070161722.08.1996         Original published format: US 701617
[1998/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0825726
Date:25.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0825726
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/707, H04B7/26
[1998/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/03]
Former [1998/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Bereitstellen von Hochgeschwindigkeitspaketdatendiensten für ein Drahtlossystem[1998/09]
English:Method for providing high-speed packet data services for a wireless system[1998/09]
French:Procédé permettant des services de données en paquets en haute vitesse pour un système sans fil[1998/09]
Examination procedure16.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
19.06.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9510145  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,16,18 * page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 6 * [A] 19,37,39;
 [PX]WO9636132  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [PX] 1-3,16,18 * page 8, line 28 - page 11, line 10; figures 1,2 *