Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0830869

EP0830869 - Needle assembly having single-handedly activated needle barrier [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/13]For all designated states
Becton, Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Allen, William J.
30 Cut Spring Road
Stratford, Connecticut 06497 / US
02 / Stein, Jeffrey A.
11 Pinehill Road
Woodbridge, Connecticut 06525 / US
[1998/13]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/13]Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date97114422.521.08.1997
[1998/13]
Priority number, dateUS1996071738420.09.1996         Original published format: US 717384
[1998/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0830869
Date:25.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0830869
Date:08.04.1998
[1998/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0830869
Date:20.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/32, A61M5/50
[1998/13]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/52]
Former [1998/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nadelvorrichtung mit einhändig aktiviertem Nadelschutz[1998/13]
English:Needle assembly having single-handedly activated needle barrier[1998/13]
French:Dispositif à aiguille avec une protection pouvant être activée d'une seule main[1998/13]
Examination procedure24.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/48]
09.10.1998Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.01.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
24.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2001Fee for grant paid
04.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.11.1998AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.1998CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.1998DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.1998FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.1998GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.1998IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.1998LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.1998MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.1998NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.1998PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.1998SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5411492  (STURMAN ET AL.) [A] 1,2,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5466223  (BECTON, DICKINSON AND COMPANY) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4994046  (WESSON ET AL.) [A] 1 * column 5, line 42 - line 63 * * abstract *;
 [A]US4915696  (FEIMER) [A] 1 * column 6, line 35 - line 41; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]GB2282069  (BRACCHI) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph L; figures 3A,3B *