Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0825183

EP0825183 - Process for the preparation of 1-acetyl-4-piperidinones [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [1998/09]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Julius, Manfred, Dr.
Speyerer Strasse 65
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
[1998/09]
Representative(s)Isenbruck, Günter , et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/09]Isenbruck, Günter, Dr. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Frohwitter-Geissler & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date97114470.421.08.1997
[1998/09]
Priority number, dateDE199613414723.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19634147
[1998/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0825183
Date:25.02.1998
Language:DE
[1998/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0825183
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07D211/74, C07D221/20
[1998/09]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1998/45]
Former [1998/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1-Acetyl-4-Piperidonen[1998/09]
English:Process for the preparation of 1-acetyl-4-piperidinones[1998/09]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de 1-acétyl-4-pipéridinones[1998/09]
Examination procedure25.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/43]
01.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1999Fee for grant paid
04.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE3800987  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *